judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEN, HENRY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CV-0679
Short Caption:ALLEN, HENRY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA9043-83Filed Date:04/25/1986

Opening Event Date:04/25/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/14/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/03/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Ruth R. Banks YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michele GiulianiYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALLEN, HENRY ET AL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
04/25/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/02/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/14/1986FiledBriefing Completed
06/03/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/25/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/26/2017FiledArchived Documents (Appellee's Brief)