judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY WATKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1168
Short Caption:LARRY WATKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1948-88Filed Date:09/09/1988

Opening Event Date:09/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/18/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/30/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Marilyn Newhouse YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WATKINS, LARRY UNITED STATES
09/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/23/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARILYN NEWHOUSE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD DSA
04/18/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/18/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (204 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD R
05/26/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 061889 SCHPRD BA
06/30/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/30/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD BE
12/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD