judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY E. HAZEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0128
Short Caption:BOBBY E. HAZEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Lead: 87-CF-0127 Consolidated:87-CF-0128
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2580-85Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/24/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby E. Hazel N
Thomas K. Clancy NN
W. Gary KohlmanNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin Ohlson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAZEL, BOBBY E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-127, 89-1160, 89-1239 & NOTE - 01 89-1376 NOTE - 02 091587 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 02 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 03 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 04 STATUS OF RT, INDICATING NAME NOTE - 04 OF CT RPTR PREPARING THE RT, NOTE - 05 THE ESTIMATED # OF PAGES TO BE NOTE - 05 FILED & ESTIMATED COMPLETION NOTE - 06 DATE OF THE RT. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 6/28/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 07 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 08 OF THOMAS CLANCY & CLK TO ENTR NOTE - 08 APPRNC OF W. GARY KOHLMAN TO NOTE - 09 RPRSNT APLT; CONS BRF OF APLT NOTE - 09 DUE 40 DATS AFTER COM RECORD. NOTE - 10 03/12/90 ORD: 1376 FOR ALL NOTE - 10 PURP; FO APLT'S BRIEF DUE W/IN NOTE - 11 10 DAYS. NFX NOTE - 11
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KOHLMANW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BUNNELLS FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 CLANCYT VACATED 6/28/88.
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (1,380 PGS. - MOLLICHELLI) PM PANEL SCDATE 041787 SCHPRD RT
08/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 SEE 87-127 (101 PGS. - RIZZA) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987ORDER SS, CONS 87-127 & 87-128; CONS BR OF APLT DUE 9/7/87. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD BA
08/21/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE NEW COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 06. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD OPE
09/23/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 9/15/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
11/09/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD CHECK
06/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF THOMAS K. CLANCY AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3( 16 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD RT
06/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD X
07/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 7TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD CHECK
09/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING RESOLUTION OF NEW TRIAL MOTION JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO STAY CASE; COUNSEL TO ADVISE IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF PENDG TRL NO. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD OPE
12/07/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/10-13 ORD OR VACATE APPOINTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD STATE
12/09/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 12/7/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD STATE
02/02/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 010987 SCHPRD CHECK
02/07/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO FEBRUARY 2ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD STATE
04/07/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD STATE
06/16/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING MOT IN TRIAL CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989STATEMENT OF APLT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070789 SCHPRD STATE
09/11/1989ORDER APLT TO ADVISE COURT W/I 10 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO IN TRIAL COURT. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD U
09/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (JUDGE SHUKER'S ORDER DATED 9/8/89) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN 87-127, 89-1160 AND 89-1239 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (SUPPLEMENTAL) THIS APPEAL W/ 87-127, 89-1160, 89-1239, 89-1376 & 89-1387 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COURT RULES ON THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 87-127, 87-128, 89-1160, 89-1239 & 89- (SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-11) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR UP TO AND INC. 4/16/90. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BA
04/23/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BR GRANTD. APLE'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD OPE
06/15/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BE
10/04/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL REQ. CASE TO BE HEARD FIRST ON THE CALENDAR RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S REQUEST TO ALLOW ARGUMENT TO START AT 8:30 AM ON 11/14/90 PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOTION TO LATE FILE REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD OPE
10/29/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1990ARGUED PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (21-PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE
10/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 3383
11/14/1991APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING TO DECEMBER 2, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REHRG DUE ON OR BEFORE 12/2/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD CHECK
12/02/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 120291 SCHPRD MRHA
01/24/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIin U.S. Supreme Court dated 4/15/92 #91-8503.
10/22/1992COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI file in supreme court
04/18/2000MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE Denied
04/28/2000On consideraton of pro se appellant's motion to recall the mandate, it is ORDERED that appellee shall, within 30 days from the date of this order file a response to appellant's motion to recall the mandate. It is F/ORDERED that appellant's motion to recall the mandate is hereby held in abeyance pending receipt of appellee's response. (BY: WASTSC)
05/26/2000APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE until 6/13.
06/08/2000On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time to file a response to appellant's motion to recall the mandate, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellee's response to the motion to recall the mandate shall be filed on or before June 13, 2000. (WASTSC)
06/13/2000APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's mot to re-call the mandate
06/26/2000APPELLANT'S REPLY to appellee's opposition to the motion to recall mandate
07/26/2000TMC - Aplt's motion to recall the mandate - Aple's opposition - Aplt's reply
07/27/2000ORD DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE (by: WGSTSC)