judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROYCE P. GRIFFIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1169
Short Caption:ROYCE P. GRIFFIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5048-87Filed Date:09/09/1988

Opening Event Date:09/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/06/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/18/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Cheryl D. SteinYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRIFFIN, ROYCE P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENDANT: DAVID N. WILSON NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 06/22/90 ORD: DIRG COUNSEL NOTE - 02 FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 NOTE - 03 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT NOTE - 03 SHOULD NOT BE VACATED & NAME NOTE - 04 REMOVED FROM PANEL OF CJA NOTE - 04 ATTORNEYS.
09/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHERYL D. STEIN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD DSA
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111088 SCHPRD DSA
01/11/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD R
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(34 PGS/PAVLISH) PANEL SCDATE 112688 SCHPRD RT
10/19/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(130 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
11/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AND MO FOR PRODUCT- ION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 112889 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR PRODUCTION OF ADD RT & EXT TO FL BRF FOR 30 DAYS AFTER RT FILED. MEH PANELNWBETE SCDATE 122089 SCHPRD VS
04/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/11/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(40 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD RT
05/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-11-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD BA
06/04/1990ORDER GRNT APLT'S MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 06-11-90. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD GR
06/22/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 - 4) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PF PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD BA
08/06/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/06/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 080690 SCHPRD BE
12/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/17/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL AD PANELRGFNBE SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD CSUM
12/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/18/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD