judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEONARD J. ADDISON, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1174
Short Caption:LEONARD J. ADDISON, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3888-87Filed Date:09/07/1988

Opening Event Date:09/07/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/28/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeonard J. Addison, Jr.N
Andrew J. DelehantyYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ADDISON JR., LEONARD J. UNITED STATES
09/07/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/23/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANDREW J.J. DELEHANTY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD DSA
12/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
12/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD R
04/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD BA
06/28/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD U
08/28/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CT RPTR JACKSON TO EXT TIME TO FILE 3/7/88 - 3/9/88 PROC. TO NOVEMBER 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1990ORDER GRANT CT RPTR JACKSON'S MO TO EXT TO FILE 3/7/88 - 3/9/88 PROC TO 11/30/90 (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 090690 SCHPRD RT
10/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(70 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 090590 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(390 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 113090 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 122490 SCHPRD B
02/28/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 030191 SCHPRD BA
03/11/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 4/1/91. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 030591 SCHPRD B
04/02/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1991RECEIVED BRIEF OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LEAVE TO FL BRF; APLT BRF FILED. APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 041891 SCHPRD K
05/01/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1991LETTER TO PRO SE RE ANDERS BRF RESPONSE DUE BY 5/31/91. AD PANELJEP SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1991ORDER CT'S O OF 4/19/91 IS VACATED; APLT MO FOR LV TO FL BR IS GR; BA IS FLD. BA IS REF TO MO DV. PANELRO SCDATE 052091 SCHPRD BE
07/26/1991AFFIRMED GRANT MO OF CNSL FOR APLT TO W/D & JUDGMENT ON APPEAL ISQ AFFIRMED. DAS PANELTESTPY SCDATE 072291 SCHPRD VS
07/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
08/28/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD