judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRYL SATTERWHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1181
Short Caption:DARRYL SATTERWHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10653-87Filed Date:09/21/1988

Opening Event Date:09/21/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/07/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John Edward Williams YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kirby D. Behre YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SATTERWHITE, DARRYL UNITED STATES
09/21/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/21/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD R
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD M
07/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(431 PGS/TAPE/ASHBLOCK) AD PANEL SCDATE 092389 SCHPRD RT
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS FROM COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD BA
10/27/1989ORDER APLT BR SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRO SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD U
11/27/1989MEMORANDUM 10/27/89 ORDER - REMAILED TO ATTORNEY'S CORRECT ADDRESS JB PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122789 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD V
02/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(94 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 28, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/28/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD K
03/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD BE
04/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(10 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/07/1990SUBMITTED PANELSCWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSCWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIDATED 11-21-90 IN U.S. SUPREME COURT #90-6296 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied