Case: 04-09-00152-CR
04-09-00152-CR
03/12/2009
Aggravated Assault
Carrie Vogel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2009 | Letter filed | | |||
08/26/2009 | Letter filed | | |||
08/14/2009 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||
08/10/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||
06/03/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
06/03/2009 | Submitted | | |||
06/03/2009 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
06/02/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
04/06/2009 | Order entered | | |||
04/03/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||
03/12/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
03/06/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
02/06/2009 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/04/2034 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
08/10/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vogel, Carrie | Criminal - Appellant | Omar Oralndo Collins |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Scott Monroe |
Trial Court Information
198th Judicial District Court
Kerr
Honorable Emil Karl Prohl
B08131
12 Years in State Penitentiary, TDC