judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES T. COGDELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0112
Short Caption:JAMES T. COGDELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead: 87-CF-0046 Consolidated:87-CF-0112
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7069-82Filed Date:01/28/1987

Opening Event Date:01/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames T. Cogdell N
Geoffrey G. Bestor NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark A. Packman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ann K. H. SimonYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COGDELL, JAMES T. AKA JESSIE JACKSON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-46 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/9/89 NOTE - 02 (NO OPE) MLH NOTE - 03 7/20/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 04 GEOFFREY BESTOR & APPT MARK NOTE - 04 PACKMAN FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 05 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 3/29/90 ORD: MO TO EXT TIME TO NOTE - 06 FILE REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED, NOTE - 07 BR DUE 4/5/90, F/O THIS APPEAL NOTE - 07 BE SCHD FOR CONSIDERATION AS NOTE - 08 SOON AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 08
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/06/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PACKMANM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 BESTORG VACATED 7/20/89.
01/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/26/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPOINT?) PANEL SCDATE 033087 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEOFFREY BESTOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
05/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987ORDER SS, CONS 87-46 & 87-112; CONS BR OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051987 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (38 PGS - SWAGERTY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (30 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (52 PGS - CARTER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (112 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
03/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/14/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING APLT BR TO AND INC. 6/20/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION TO APPOINT MARK PACKMAN IN PLACE OF GEOFFREY BESTOR FOR APPELLANT & TO EXTEND (NOTE 2) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARK A. PACKMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 062289 SCHPRD CHECK
08/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/28/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/28/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD N
09/28/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD V
12/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(110 PGS/DAVIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-21-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD BE
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 8 PGS. -- RHOADES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF NO OPPO TO 3-26-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S TO APRIL 5, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/29/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990ORDER THE LODGED APLE'S BRIEF IS HEREBY FILED. F/O THAT APLT'S (SEE NOTES 6 THRU 8) JB PANELDDW SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD U
04/05/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD RBA
06/13/1990LETTER RE ERROR IN REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990LETTER TRANSMITTED 6/8/90 LTR OF COUNSEL RE ERROR TO DIVISION. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1990RECEIVED 681 PAGES BY RONAN AND 198 PAGES BY SCHERTZER GIVEN TO CHAMBERS FOR ARGUMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/28/1990ARGUED RJG PANELFESTPY SCDATE 062890 SCHPRD CREG
07/03/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/11/1990RECEIVED SR#7 (198 PGS.--SCHERTZER) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(676 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1990MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 8-7-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEF 8/7/90 SL PANELRO SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD N
08/08/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB TO & INCLUDING 8/10 MEH PANELRO SCDATE 080790 SCHPRD MRRB
08/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APLT) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD