Case: 10-0531
10-0531
07/16/2010
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
DANIEL LEE HAINING
THU-DUNG T. HAINING
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/02/2010 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to Petition for Review. | |
08/02/2010 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Daniel Lee Haining. (12) |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/25/2010 | Case Stored | Row 17 I-3 | | |
10/19/2010 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
09/03/2010 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/03/2010 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/02/2010 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver (3) filed on behalf of Thu-Dung Haining. | | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to Petition for Review. | | |
08/02/2010 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Daniel Lee Haining. (12) | ||
07/20/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition is due July 30, 2010 | |
07/16/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Daniel Lee Haining. (3) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/25/2010 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 17 I-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Haining, Thu-Dung T. | Respondent | Mr. Tuananh Mai Mr. Douglas Ray York Ms. JoAnn Storey |
Haining, Daniel Lee | Petitioner | Mr. Michael P. Von Blon Ms. Lucy H. Forbes Mr. A. Glenn Diddel III Mr. Thomas R. Conner Ms. Julia Leigh Dean |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-08-00091-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
___ SW3d ___, 03-25-10
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Laura C. Higley
Trial Court Information
308th District Court
Harris
Honorable Georgia Dempster
2006-13649