judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF BEAUMONT, TEXAS v. JENSAM CORPORATION, JENNIE FERTITTA, ET AL.

Case: A-11007
A-11007
05/12/1942
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF BEAUMONT, TEXAS
JENSAM CORPORATION, JENNIE FERTITTA, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1967Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/18/1967Supplement to ResponseRespondent
07/13/1966Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/22/1966Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
08/18/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/26/1967Dissenting opinion issued.
04/26/1967Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
04/18/1967Supplement to Response
07/18/1966Response to Motion filed
07/13/1966Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/22/1966Motion for Rehearing
01/17/1966Response to Petition
10/06/1965Document received (See Remarks)
08/18/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/18/1965Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1942Letter Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jennie Fertitta, et al.Respondent
Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
Jensam CorporationRespondent
City of Beaumont, TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information