judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MALECON TOBACCO VS. STATE, TAXATION

Case Information: 38101
Short Caption:MALECON TOBACCO VS. STATE, TAXATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0100482AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/14/2002 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/14/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of John S. Bartlett--check no. 1345.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11026
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: June 28, 2001. 01-11148
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/13/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-11914
07/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
11/07/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-18599
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-19256
12/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-20645
03/19/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/18/02. Signed by: John S. Bartlett. 02-04920
03/19/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-04921
04/22/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Notice of Change of Representation of Respondent State of Nevada Department of Taxation. Deputy Attorney General Henna Rasul in place of Senior Deputy A.G. Elaine Guenaga. 02-07159
04/22/2002Other Returned Unfiled Document. Respondent's Answering Brief.
04/24/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 04/24/02. Signed by: Henna Rasul. 02-07280
05/01/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Take Judicial Notice. 02-07689
05/13/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Take Judicial Notice. 02-08381
05/24/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 14, 2002. 02-09178
06/13/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand deliverd 06/13/02. 02-10251
07/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny respondent's motion for this court to take judicial notice. 02-11369
08/22/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 14, 2002, at 2:00 p.m. (NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA)
09/30/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/02/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Representation of Respondent State of Nevada Department of Taxation. 02-17084
10/14/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA
12/19/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Young, C.J., Rose and Agosti, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 83. NNP03Y. 02-21690
01/14/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-00450
01/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2003. 03-00450