judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEREMIAH LEE ROGERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0115)
Case Number:S-07-0115Case Docketed On:05/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:JEREMIAH LEE ROGERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEREMIAH LEE ROGERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeremiah Lee RogersDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Scott Mitchel Guthrie
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 90
Citation:189 P.3d 265

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/29/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
06/19/2007Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
08/02/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/17/2007Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
10/10/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/12/2007Order - Other - Order rescheduling oral argument (moved from 11/15/07 to 11/14/07.OrderOtherFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dana Lent for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk A. Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Dana Jill Lent, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/31/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified question, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/18/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal