judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ROBERT KIMBROUGH, APLT

Case Information: 10-FM-0890
Short Caption:IN RE: ROBERT KIMBROUGH, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3459-09Filed Date:07/13/2010

Opening Event Date:07/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/26/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaePublic Defender Service
James W. KleinNY
Jaclyn S. FrankfurtYY
Amicus-AppelleeDomestic Violence Legal Empowerment and Appeals ProjectN
Joan S. MeierNY
AppellantRobert Kimbrough Y
Cynthia NordoneYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cynthia Nordone, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4 pgs/tape) 10/16/09 proc.
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (25 pgs/tape) 10/16/09 proc.
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (18 pgs/tape) 10/19/09 proc.
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (77 pgs/tape) 6/30/10 proc. cd attached
09/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/16/2010RECORD COPIES
09/16/2010RECORD INDEX
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (10 pgs/tape) 6/30/10 proc. w/cd
10/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (titled as: motion to stay briefing) until completion of record
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (15 pgs/tape) 6/30/10 proc.
11/03/2010ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
12/13/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
12/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 13, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY the briefing schedule until the Court resolves the pending motion in 00-FM-925 and 04-FM-1269 (In re:John Robertson)
01/14/2011ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY and this appeal is hereby stayed pending decision in consolidated appeal nos. 00-FM-925 & 04-FM-1269. (ETW)
01/14/2011CASE STAYED
06/02/2011 On further consideration fo this court's order of January 14, 2011, which stayed this appeal pending decisions in appeals nos. 00-FM-925 and 04-FM-1269, and it apeparing that the court has decided those matters, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that the stay entered by this court on January 14, 2011, is hereby vacated. It is (MORE)
06/02/2011 ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
06/02/2011PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
07/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
07/19/2011FiledGRANTING Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/11/11.
08/10/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledAppendix incorporated in the brief. (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
10/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) 10/14/11
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 14, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
11/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 14, 2011 (Appellee)
11/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/14/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/21/2011FiledMOTION - Appear Amicus (Amicus-Appellee)
12/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
12/07/2011FiledNotice Received from aple(us) advising cour that 12/2/11 aple filed a (MEXB)IN seperated appeal inadvertently and a corrected motion was filed (Appellee)
12/08/2011FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED AMICUS BRIEF//APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
12/20/2011FiledOrder Granting motion to appear as amicus curiae and filed lodged brief and appendix (FIBRTE)
12/20/2011FiledOrder Denying appellee's motion for an extension of time as moot. (FIBRTE)
12/20/2011FiledBrief (Amicus-Appellee)
12/20/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Amicus-Appellee)
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/07/2012FiledMOTION - Appear Amicus (Amicus Curiae - Public Defender Service)Granted
02/13/2012FiledAnswer/Response to motion of public defender service for leave to participate as amicus and to file amicus brief out of time (Appellee)
02/23/2012FiledOrder Granting MOTION - Appear Amicus (Amicus Curiae - Public Defender Service)
02/28/2012FiledMotion To Strike brief of the United States (Appellant)Denied
03/05/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion to strike brief on the United States (Appellee)
03/09/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte - held in abeyance & referred to merits upon assignment
03/22/2012FiledBrief (Amicus Curiae - Public Defender Service)
04/23/2012FiledBrief ( in response to Amicus Curiae's brief) (Appellee)
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/10/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Amicus Curiae)
07/24/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Amicus Curiae)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/09/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Amicus Curiae)
08/09/2012FiledMotion to participate in oral argument. (Amicus Curiae)Granted
08/10/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion to strike brief of the United States.
08/13/2012FiledMotion for leave to participate as amicus in oral argument (Amicus-Appellee)Granted
08/14/2012FiledOrder Granting PDS motion to participate as Amicus in oral argument.
08/14/2012FiledReply Brief (Amicus Curiae)
08/22/2012FiledOrder Granting (DV LEAP) motion to participate in oral argument.
08/30/2012FiledSupplemental Record#7 (67-pgs/tape 6/30/10 proc.)
09/06/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
09/10/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
09/12/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Fisher, Thompson Jaclyn S. Frankfurt, Esq. for amicus curiae Nicholas P. Coleman, Esq. for appellee Joan Meier, Esq. for amicus-appellee
09/13/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From
08/20/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
09/04/2013FiledReversed (Glickman, Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges)
09/26/2013FiledMandate