judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD B. DOBSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0114
Short Caption:RICHARD B. DOBSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6952-86Filed Date:01/20/1987

Opening Event Date:01/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/03/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/12/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard B. Dobson N
Charles T. Taylor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOBSON, RICHARD B. UNITED STATES
01/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 020287 SCHPRD CHECK
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD R
03/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (3/12/87 ORDER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES T. TAYLOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: TRANSCRIPT ORD FOR THIS APPEAL? EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/20/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 10TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 082087 SCHPRD STATE
11/24/1987ORDER MATTER OF RT REFERRED TO THE TRIAL JUDGE FOR CONSIDERATION IN THE FIRST INSTANCE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD CHECK
02/03/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/03/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (359 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD RT
02/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BR IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD BA
04/21/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BA
05/24/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/23/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/26/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 7/26/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD V
07/27/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG DAS PANEL SCDATE 072688 SCHPRD BE
07/27/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/09/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD