judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEFALAS, CHRISTOPHER RIGGS NATIONAL BANK OF

Case Information: 86-CV-0619
Short Caption:KEFALAS, CHRISTOPHER RIGGS NATIONAL BANK OFClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA13849-84Filed Date:04/03/1986

Opening Event Date:04/03/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/27/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/11/1986
Argued/Submitted:11/21/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Dimitri P. Mallios YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Edward M. Kimmel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Jefferson M. Gray YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KEFALAS, CHRISTOPHER RIGGS NATIONAL BANK OF WASHINGTON D.C.
04/03/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/11/1986FiledBriefing Completed
11/21/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/25/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition