judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT REALTY TITLE BYRNES, ARTHUR F.

Case Information: 86-CV-0593
Short Caption:DISTRICT REALTY TITLE BYRNES, ARTHUR F.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:86-CV-0593Consolidated: 86-CV-0594
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10411-80Filed Date:03/24/1986

Opening Event Date:03/24/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/21/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/26/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael A. Schuchat YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Diane P. Burka NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard Murray YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DISTRICT REALTY TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION BYRNES, ARTHUR F.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 *86-594 IS LEAD CASE* THIS IS NOTE - 01 A CROSS APPEAL* NOTE - 02 061986 ORDER; CLK TO FILE LDGD NOTE - 02 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENTS; GRANT NOTE - 03 MO TO CONS #86-594 & 86-593; NOTE - 03 NO 7A; APLTS TO FILE DR & SRT NOTE - 04 W/CLK OF SUP CT & SERVE COPIES NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 86-594 *THIS IS LEAD CASE* NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 7/22/86 ORD: GRT MO. TO FILE NOTE - 06 AMENDED DR; COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 07 APLE/X-APLT DIRECTED TO MAKE NOTE - 07 ARRANGEMENTS TO HAVE EXHIBITS NOTE - 08 TRANSMITTED TO THIS COURT AS A NOTE - 08 SUPPLEMENTAL REC. FORTHWITH
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/05/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MURRAYR FOR - BYRNES ATTY 2 - SCHUCHATM FOR - O'CONNOR et al.
03/21/1986RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/08/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO CAS & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040886 SCHPRD CAS
05/09/1986RECEIVED APLT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CAS TO 5/26/86 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1986RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1986MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT TO MAY 26TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 8TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 051986 SCHPRD ANSA
05/27/1986RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO 5/8/86 OTSC JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NUMBERS 86-594 AND 86-593 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1986RECEIVED STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT IN 86-594 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 052186 SCHPRD OPE
06/24/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT (DISTRICT-REALTY) GG PANEL SCDATE 063086 SCHPRD DR
06/26/1986ORDER APLE-X-APLT, BYRNES, BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 063086 SCHPRD CHECK
07/02/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE (BYRNES) FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1986APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 080586 SCHPRD BEA
07/22/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 8 SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (76 PGS - SIMMS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987ORDER APLE-X-APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF SUP REC & RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080486 SCHPRD SR
06/05/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT RE ORDER 6/1/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD STATE
07/30/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (364 PGS. - SCHERTZER & RHOADES) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/31/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BEA
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT-X-APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/20/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD CHECK
11/20/1987APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND LIST & APPENDIX (ARTHUR BYRNES) JB PANEL SCDATE 112087 SCHPRD BEA
12/21/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/21/1987APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF AND LIST & APPENDIX JB (DISTRICT-REALTY TITLE INSURANCE CORP.) PANEL SCDATE 122587 SCHPRD BAE
01/07/1988APPELLANT-CROSS-APPELLEE REPLY BRIEF (ARTHUR F. BYRNES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/1988ARGUED PANELPYNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/13/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD