judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRADLEY, DAVID LEE CHARLES H. TOMPKINS COMPANY

Case Information: 86-CV-0595
Short Caption:BRADLEY, DAVID LEE CHARLES H. TOMPKINS COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4390-83Filed Date:03/27/1986

Opening Event Date:03/27/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/28/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William C. Burgy NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James M. Heffler NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
L. Ridge, Jr.NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ralph N. Boccarosse NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert L. FergusonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRADLEY, DAVID LEE CHARLES H. TOMPKINS COMPANY ET AL
03/27/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/18/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1986COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1986MEMORANDUM NO 7A...APLT BRIEF DUE 40 DAYS /AFTER COMPLETE R DOCKETED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1986FiledRecord Completed
05/28/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 053086 SCHPRD R
06/24/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING DECISION IN 85-543 GG PANEL SCDATE 070786 SCHPRD BA
07/07/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1986ORDER GRANTG MO TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DEC IN 85-543. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 071086 SCHPRD RBH
07/20/1988ORDER PARTIES TO FL MEMORANDA IN 20 DAYS ADDRESSING EFFECT OF DEC IN 85-577 ON THIS APPEAL. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD CHECK
07/25/1988APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JULY 20TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD ANSE
08/05/1988APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 7/20/88 (THE DAYTON SURE-GRIP & SHORE COMPANY) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 7/20/88 & REQUEST FOR STAY PENDING RULING IN ESTEP V CONSTRUCTION GENERAL, ETAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD ANSA
09/06/1988APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEOF HARRY HOBBS IN 85-577 FOR 1 WEEK EXT. TO 9/13/88 TO MRRB RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988LETTER OF PETITIONER & AMICI IN 85-577 PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1989ORDER APLT OTSC IN 10 DAYS WHY JUDGMENT ON APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE SUMMARILY AFFIRMED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPA
07/13/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IN LIGHT OF DEC IN 85-543. ACG PANELBETE SCDATE 041589 SCHPRD TMC
07/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
08/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD