judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BYRNES, ARTHUR F. O'CONNOR, JUSTIN

Case Information: 86-CV-0594
Short Caption:BYRNES, ARTHUR F. O'CONNOR, JUSTINClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 86-CV-0593 Consolidated:86-CV-0594
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10411-80Filed Date:03/11/1986

Opening Event Date:03/11/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/21/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/26/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard Murray YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Guy R. Pietrovito NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael A. Schuchat YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BYRNES, ARTHUR F. O'CONNOR, JUSTIN ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 *THIS IS LEAD CASE* 86-593 IS NOTE - 01 A CROSS APPEAL* NOTE - 02 061986 ORDER: CLK DIR TO FILE NOTE - 02 LDGD CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENTS; NOTE - 03 GRANT MO TO CONS #86-594 & 86- NOTE - 03 593; NO 7A; APLTS TO FILE DR & NOTE - 04 SRT W/CLK OF SUP CT & SERVE NOTE - 04 COPIES. NOTE - 05 CON 86-593 *86-594 LEAD CASE* NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 7/22/86 ORD: GRT MO. TO FILE NOTE - 06 AMENDED DR; COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 07 APLT/X-APLE DIRECTED TO MAKE NOTE - 07 ARRANGEMENTS TO HAVE EXHIBITS NOTE - 08 TRANSMITTED TO THIS COURT AS NOTE - 08 A SUPPLEMENTAL REC. FORTHWITH
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/05/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MURRAYR FOR - BYRNES ATTY 2 - SCHUCHATM FOR - O'CONNOR et al.
03/11/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/08/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAY OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO CAS & NO FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032686 SCHPRD CAS
05/16/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 8TH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE JB PANEL SCDATE 051986 SCHPRD ANSA
05/16/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NUMBERS 86-594 AND 86-593 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELP SCDATE 052686 SCHPRD CHECK
06/24/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT (DISTRICT-REALTY) GG PANEL SCDATE 063086 SCHPRD DR
06/26/1986ORDER APLT-X-APLE, BYRNES, BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 063086 SCHPRD CHECK
07/02/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT (BYRNES) FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1986APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 080586 SCHPRD BAE
07/22/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 8 SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (76 PGS - SIMMS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987ORDER APLT-X-APLE IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATES RE: STATUS OF SUP REC & STATUS OF RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080486 SCHPRD SR
06/05/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE RE ORDER 6/1/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD STATE
07/30/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (364 PGS. - SCHERTZER & RHOADES) SEE 86-593 PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/31/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BAE
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE-X-APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/20/87;NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD CHECK
11/20/1987APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF AND LIST & APPENDIX (ARTHUR BYRNES) JB PANEL SCDATE 112087 SCHPRD BAE
12/21/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/21/1987APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND LIST & APPENDIX JB (DISTRICT-REALTY TITLE INSURANCE COPR.) PANEL SCDATE 122587 SCHPRD BEA
01/07/1988APPELLANT-CROSS-APPELLEE REPLY BRIEF (ARTHUR F. BYRNES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/1988ARGUED PANELPYNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/13/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD