judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES R. CASEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1171
Short Caption:JAMES R. CASEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F152-88Filed Date:09/12/1988

Opening Event Date:09/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/03/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/02/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames R. Casey N
G. Godwin Oyewole NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
William E. Seals YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CASEY, JAMES R. AKA WITCLIFF D. RHODEN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/17/89 ORD: APPMT OF G. GOD- NOTE - 01 WIL OYEWOLE IS VACATED; CLK TO NOTE - 02 FL DSA; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER REC FILED. NOTE - 03 4/24/91 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MO NOTE - 03 TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRF UNTIL NOTE - 04 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED, F/O NOTE - 04 THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT SHALL NOTE - 05 FILE A STATE W/IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 05 INFORMING THIS COURT OF THE NOTE - 06 STATUS OF PENDING TRANSCRIPT. NOTE - 06
01/01/1906 OYEWOLEG VACATED 3/17/89
09/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/23/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DSA & TO PERMIT COUNSEL (G. OYEWOLE) TO WITHDRAW GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 10 DAYS WHETHER HE HAS RETAINED COUNSL ON HIS OWN BEHALF. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD N
01/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD R
02/02/1989ORDER DENY COUNSEL MO TO W/DRAW; DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD ANSA
02/10/1989APPEARANCE OF WILLIAM E. SEALS FOR APPEL- LANT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 2/2/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-02. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD Q
04/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO STAY BRFING SCHD, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 060690 SCHPRD U
07/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(172 PGS/SALAZAR) AD PANEL SCDATE 083090 SCHPRD RT
10/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(100 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD RT
02/11/1991ORDER APLT BRF TO BE FLD W/IN 40 DYS FROM DT OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 101290 SCHPRD GR
03/13/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 032591 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1991ORDER (SEE NOTES 3 THRU 6) JB PANELJB SCDATE 041191 SCHPRD TO
05/14/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE: TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (129 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 060291 SCHPRD RT
06/11/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE 8/7/91, APLE BRF DUE 9/6/91, RBA DUE 9/25/91. SCHD ON DECEMBER CAL. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 060691 SCHPRD K
08/07/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 080791 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1991FiledBriefing Completed
09/06/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 090691 SCHPRD BE
12/03/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/03/1991SUBMITTED PANELTEKGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTEKGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/02/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD