judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAPITOL HILL HOSPITAL JONES, ANNA L.

Case Information: 86-CV-0629
Short Caption:CAPITOL HILL HOSPITAL JONES, ANNA L.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA12025-83Filed Date:04/10/1986

Opening Event Date:04/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/09/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/22/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/28/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard W. Boone YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Vicki J. Hunt NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William C. Burgy YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Karl N. Marshall NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CAPITOL HILL HOSPITAL ET AL JONES, ANNA L.
04/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/09/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/13/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition