judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

H. E. DENBOW v. STANDARD ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: A-405
A-405
12/11/1944
Application for Writ of Error
H. E. DENBOW
STANDARD ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/26/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/13/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/07/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
12/11/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/12/1954Letter Filed
04/20/1945Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
03/26/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/13/1945Supplemental Brief filed
02/09/1945Letter Filed
02/07/1945Response to Petition
01/22/1945Order from Lower Court filed
01/10/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1945Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. E. DenbowPetitioner
Standard Accident Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information