judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MAXEY (KENSHAWN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36253
Short Caption:MAXEY (KENSHAWN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34052 , 37941 , 44514 , 48461 , 54521 , 67296 , 67296-COA , 69329 , 75771 , 75771-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151122Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/08/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-09804
06/15/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-10175
06/15/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/17/98, 9/15/98, 11/2/98, 11/16/98, 9/10/99. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 00-10176
06/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/23/00. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 00-10663
06/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/18/98 (Roger Calabrese); 7/8/98 (Kit MacDonald); 8/17/98 (Diann Prock); 8/24/98 (Renee Silvaggio); 9/15/98 (Diann Prock); 11/2/98 (Diann Prock); 11/16/98 (Diann Prock); 8/31/98 (Peggy Cardwell); 9/10/99 (Diann Prock). 00-10664
06/30/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 8, 1998. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 00-11182
07/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 23, 2000. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 00-12961
08/21/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 31, 1999. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 00-14610
08/25/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Roger Calabrese. The transcript will be completed within two days. 00-14958
09/01/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 18, 1998. Court Reporter: Roger D. Calabrese. 00-15485
10/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-17533
11/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, court reporter Silvaggio has not filed the transcript requested of her. Accordingly, court reporter Silvaggio shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcript of proceedings conducted on August 24, 1998, to file a motion for an extension of time to do so, or to inform this court in writing why the requested transcript cannot be produced. On October 3, 2000, appellant filed a motion for a first extension of time within which to file the opening brief and appendix. We grant appellant's motion. Appellant shall have 110 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable 00-19187
11/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. --Affidavit from Renee Silvaggio. 00-20639
12/04/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Renee Silvaggio's request for an extension of time submitted on November 27, 2000, is granted. Court reporter Silvagio shall have 21 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the completed transcript of proceedings conducted on August 24, 1998. 00-21067
01/16/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 24, 1998. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 01-00935
02/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-03232
03/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix on or before April 9, 2001. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-05126
04/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has not filed the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. 01-06984
05/16/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-08093
05/16/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. (46 pages). 01-08094
06/07/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. 01-09545
07/13/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-11933
07/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file the forty-six page opening brief and appendix received on May 16, 2001. On July 13, 2001, respondent filed a motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. We grant the motion respondent shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 01-12076
07/16/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 01-08097
07/16/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 17. 01-08099
07/20/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 41 pages. 01-12348
07/20/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-12372
08/21/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-14142
10/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 01-16829
10/08/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/09/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court to correct appellant's sentence as directed by this order." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-15445
10/04/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15500
10/04/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/21/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2002. 02-15500