judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JDS DESIGNS INC. V. DC DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Information: 10-AA-0944
Short Caption:JDS DESIGNS INC. V. DC DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Transportation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DTVM102756-08Filed Date:08/06/2010

Opening Event Date:08/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJDS Designs IncorporatedNPro SeN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Department of TransportationN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/05/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/05/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
08/06/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (Came in on 7/22/10 in letter format without fee or final decision)
08/26/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
09/08/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
09/08/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/23/2011FiledOrder directing petitioner to identify counsel
09/23/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/10/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
11/10/2011FiledDismissed
12/02/2011FiledMandate