judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIKE (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36254
Short Caption:LIKE (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41628 , 42383 , 45972 , 53525
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117900Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/04/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09806
07/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney David Schieck shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. This appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-11960
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. 00-12274
07/24/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on June 23, 2000, and Notice of Entry of Order filed June 26, 2000. 00-12707
07/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/31/00. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 00-12948
07/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Compliance with Order of July 12, 2000 from District Judge Mark Gibbons (enclosing copy of district court order filed 6/23/00). 00-12950
08/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 12, 2000, this court entered an order indicating that this appeal is governed by the fast track provisions of NRAP 3C. Upon further review, it appears that this appeal is not subject to the fast track provisions because it involves a case in which a sentence of life with the posibility of parole was actually imposed. Counsel shall disregard the directives in this court's order of July 12, 2000. Instead, appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-13895
08/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 31, 2000. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 00-13975
09/01/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-15495
11/14/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 22, 2000. 00-19893
11/28/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 39 pages. 00-20694
11/28/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 11/22/00. 00-20727
11/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-20729
12/22/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 29, 2001. 00-22334
01/30/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-01944
01/30/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-01945
02/26/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 27, 2001. 01-03602
03/29/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 01-05467
04/03/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before April 26, 2001. 01-05717
04/27/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-07124
05/02/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. 01-07320
05/04/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 05/04/01. 01-07482
05/04/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19072
12/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19659
12/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19659