judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANK J. GARCIA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-53)
Case Number:06-53Case Docketed On:03/10/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:FRANK J. GARCIA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FRANK J. GARCIA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank J. GarciaRichard Bruce Lipka
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 48
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/10/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/10/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/10/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/10/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/17/2006Event - Phone Call. Received insufficient number of copies of brief, contacted counsel.EventPhone CallFinal
04/20/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/25/2006Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellee indicating that although the certificate of service on brief of appellant says it was served on 4/14/06, the postage mark indicates 4/20/06. Since a request for extension of time will be filed anyway, no action necessary.EventPhone CallFinal
05/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/31/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/29/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/18/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/25/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I and II, original papers; Volume III, confidential file; Volume IV, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/16/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/03/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Signed for on 4/6/07 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal