Case: 18-0473
18-0473
05/25/2018
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LAURA PERILLA-VARGAS
BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE, SHAFEEQ SHEIKH, M.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/11/2019 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | |||||
02/04/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shafeeq Sheikh, M.D. | |||||
12/31/2018 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas | |||||
10/16/2018 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | |||||
10/01/2018 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sheikh Shafeeq, M.D. | |||||
06/25/2018 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/25/2019 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
06/14/2019 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
04/11/2019 | Reply Brief | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | ||||||
03/27/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Reply brief is due no later than April 11, 2019. |
| ||||
03/22/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | ||||||
02/21/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due no later than March 22, 2019. |
| ||||
02/20/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | ||||||
02/04/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shafeeq Sheikh, M.D. | ||||||
01/18/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's Brief is due February 5, 2019. Reply Brief is due February 20, 2019. |
| ||||
01/18/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent’s Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shafeeq Sheikh, MD. | ||||||
01/11/2019 | Motion to substitute disposed | Filing granted | Motion to Substitute Counsel has been granted. |
| ||||
12/31/2018 | Brief on the Merits | Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas | ||||||
12/31/2018 | Motion to Substitute filed | Motion to Substitute Counsel filed on behalf of Beth Watkins, et al. | ||||||
12/17/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due no later than Decemer 31, 2018; Respondent's brief is due January 22, 2019; and Reply brief is due February 6, 2019. |
| ||||
12/17/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | ||||||
12/14/2018 | Case Record Filed | Electronic Appellate Record received | | |||||
11/19/2018 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | Record requested from the 1st COA | | |||||
11/16/2018 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than December 17, 2018; Response brief due January 7, 2019; Reply brief due January 22, 2019. |
| |||||
10/16/2018 | Reply to Response | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. | ||||||
10/01/2018 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sheikh Shafeeq, M.D. | ||||||
08/31/2018 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than October 1, 2018. |
| |||||
07/31/2018 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
07/25/2018 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Sheikh Shafeeq, M.D. | ||||||
07/25/2018 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Baylor College of Medicine. | ||||||
06/25/2018 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. |
| |||||
05/25/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. Petition for Review is due on June 25, 2018. |
| ||||
05/25/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Perilla-Vargas. |
| |||||
05/25/2018 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/25/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Baylor College of Medicine | Respondent | Mr. Jeffrey B. McClure |
Shafeeq Sheikh, M.D. | Respondent | Ms. Manasi T. Tahiliani Mrs. Elizabeth Dale Burrus |
Laura Perilla-Vargas | Petitioner | Mr. Mark A. Weycer Ms. Morgan A. McPheeters Mr. Kirk L. Pittard |
Harris County Hospital District d/b/a Harris Health System, d/b/a Ben Taub General Hospital | Respondent | Ms. Ebon Holt Swofford |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-17-00018-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 04-10-18
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Jennifer Caughey
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable Lawrence David Weiman
2015-62240