judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

NEWELL E. FRANCE v. TONI SIEGLER

Case: C-5091
C-5091
03/12/1986
App Writ of Error
NEWELL E. FRANCE
TONI SIEGLER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
05/22/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/27/1986Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/12/1986Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
05/22/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/08/1986Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
04/16/1986Application for Writ of Error - DisposedRefused. No Reversible Error
04/02/1986Case forwarded to Court
04/02/1986No description available.
03/27/1986Reply to Response
03/12/1986Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/08/1986Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
01-85-00648-CV
Reversed & Rendered
704 SW2d 429
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Thomas R. Phillips
84-44,535