Case: 12-0113
12-0113
02/08/2012
APPEAL REGARDING ATTORNEY DISCIPLINARY ACTION
IN THE MATTER OF R. LEONADIS MCKINNEY STATE BAR CARD NO. 13723400
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/11/2012 | Reply Brief | Appellant in case | Reply Brief filed on behalf of R. Leonadis McKinney. HARD COPIES RECEIVED. | |
06/29/2012 | Appellees' Brief filed | Appellee in case | Brief of Appellee Commission for Lawyer Discipline (HARD COPIES REC'D) | |
05/02/2012 | Appellant's Brief filed | Appellant in case | Appellant's Brief filed on behalf of R. Leonadis McKinney. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | |
02/08/2012 | Disciplinary Appeal filed | Appellant in case | E-FILED R. Leonadis McKinney's Notice of Appeal pursuant to Rule 7.11, Texas Rules of Disciplinary Procedure. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/21/2014 | Case Stored - stored case location updated | Row 11 F-2 | | |||
11/09/2012 | Case Stored | Row 21 E-3 | | |||
08/31/2012 | Disciplinary Appeal disposed | Court of Appeals' judgment affirmed | |
| ||
07/11/2012 | Reply Brief | Reply Brief filed on behalf of R. Leonadis McKinney. HARD COPIES RECEIVED. | ||||
06/29/2012 | Appellees' Brief filed | Brief of Appellee Commission for Lawyer Discipline (HARD COPIES REC'D) | ||||
06/09/2012 | Court reporter/recorder's record | McKinney v. CDL, Reporter's Record - Compulsory Hearing (*40pgs) and McKinney v. CDL BODA No. 48984 - Reporter's Record Exhibits (*35pgs). | | |||
05/29/2012 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Appellee's Brief is due July 2, 2012. | |||
05/24/2012 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief of Appellee filed on behalf of the Commission for Lawyer Discipline. | ||||
05/24/2012 | Designation of Lead Counsel | Appellee's Lead Counsel Notice: Linda A. Acevedo, Office of the Chief Disciplinary Counsel, State Bar of Texas, PO Box 12487, Austin, Texas 78711, Tel (512)427-1350. | ||||
05/02/2012 | Appellant's Brief filed | Appellant's Brief filed on behalf of R. Leonadis McKinney. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | ||||
02/16/2012 | Designation of Lead Counsel | E-FILED Notice of Appearance & Designation of Attorney of Record for the Commission of Lawyer Discipline. Direct all communications to Cynthia Hamilton. | ||||
02/14/2012 | Clerk's Record | BODA Clerk's Record Vol. 1 (one hard copy) | | |||
02/08/2012 | Disciplinary Appeal filed | E-FILED R. Leonadis McKinney's Notice of Appeal pursuant to Rule 7.11, Texas Rules of Disciplinary Procedure. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/21/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 11 F-2 |
11/09/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 21 E-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Commission for Lawyer Discipline | Appellee | Ms. Judith Anne Gres Deberry Ms. Cynthia West Canfiel Hamilton Ms. Linda Acevedo |
Board of Disciplinary Appeal | Other interested party | Ms. Gayle Riley Vickers |
McKinney, R. Leonadis | Appellant | Mr. Wayne H. Paris |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
BODA No. 48984