Case: 04-11-00074-CV
04-11-00074-CV
01/27/2011
Mandamus/prohibition
In re Perry Theodore Donop III, Relator
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/27/2011 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/16/2015 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||
11/15/2011 | Fee paid | | |||
03/07/2011 | Motion for rehearing denied | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
03/07/2011 | Order entered | | |||
02/25/2011 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
02/25/2011 | Record filed | | |||
02/25/2011 | Fee paid | | |||
02/16/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||
02/16/2011 | Submitted | | |||
02/16/2011 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
02/09/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/09/2011 | Internal memo | | |||
02/09/2011 | Petition for writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
02/09/2011 | Order entered | | |||
02/03/2011 | Letter filed | | |||
02/02/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
01/28/2011 | Fee paid | | |||
01/27/2011 | Record filed | | |||
01/27/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||
01/27/2011 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/16/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/16/2017 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gabriel, Judge John D. | Respondent | |
Donop, III, Perry T. | Relator | J. Ken Nunley Ryan C. Reed Kelly Putney Rogers Kathy H. Waldrop |
Reimherr, Amanda | Real party in interest | Lisa A. Vance Deanna L. Whitley |
Trial Court Information
288th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable John D. Gabriel, Jr.
2004-EM5-04580