judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Nishal Keshav Rajsakha v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-16-00489-CR
05-16-00489-CR
04/26/2016
Driving While Intoxicated
Nishal Keshav Rajsakha
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/06/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/29/2017Mandate issued
07/05/2017Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant
06/19/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/19/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
05/10/2017Submitted
03/24/2017Set for submission on oral argument
02/06/2017Case ready to be set
02/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/04/2017State brief due
01/05/2017State brief due
01/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/13/2016Appearance of counsel
12/06/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/06/2016Appellants brief due
12/01/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/26/2016Appellants brief due
10/27/2016Appellants brief due
10/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/27/2016Reporters record filed
09/27/2016Order enteredReinstate Appeal
09/27/2016Case reinstated
09/23/2016Exhibits filed
09/23/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
09/23/2016Reporters record received not filed
09/10/2016Hearing record due
08/11/2016Order issuedAbated
06/09/2016No reporters record filed in criminal case
06/08/2016Record due
06/06/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed
06/06/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed
05/11/2016Docketing statement filed
05/11/2016Corrected document requested
05/11/2016Motion to substitute attorney filed
04/26/2016Docketing statement due
04/26/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
04/21/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court
03/07/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
02/09/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/19/2042RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
08/29/2017Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasFaith Johnson  
Anne B. Weatherholt
Rajsakha, Nishal KeshavCriminal - AppellantKevin B. Ross
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Dan Patterson
MB-1358026-A
Vicki L. Tuck