judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THERESA M. WRIGHT V. KEVIN POWELL

Case Information: 10-FM-0932
Short Caption:THERESA M. WRIGHT V. KEVIN POWELLClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2577-07Filed Date:07/23/2010

Opening Event Date:07/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/25/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheresa M. Wright NPro SeN
AppelleeKevin Powell N
Elizabeth HughesYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 23, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
09/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/request for transcripts & receipt 6/22/10 (rt. needed) - CD ready per WTTS
10/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (27 pgs/tape) 6/22/10 proc. w/cd
10/25/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/28/2010RECORD INDEX
11/03/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 14, 2011
12/27/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 14, 2011. (JAC)
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/15/11.
01/18/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief.
01/19/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - aplt has failed to serve him.
01/28/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF on or before February 15, 2011. (ETW)
03/02/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 28, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix on or before February 15, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
03/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
04/04/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief
04/04/2011APPEARANCE- of Elizabeth Hughes on behalf of aple
04/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief,and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 15, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing a good cause. (ETW)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (no appendix)
05/31/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant was filed with this court on May 15, 2011, and it further appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before May 16, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of respondent shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC)
06/15/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
06/15/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Appendix
06/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
06/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/22/2011APPENDIX
07/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File for 10 days Appendix, Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File for 10 days Appendix, Brief (Appellee) on or before 8/1/11.
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 7 days Brief (Appellee)
08/05/2011FiledNotice Received aplt consents to motion for continuance. (Appellee)
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 7 days Brief (Appellee)
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellee)
08/18/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/22/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Ferren
03/30/2012FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
04/23/2012FiledMandate