judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROGER ROLLINS v. WYOMING TRIBUNE-EAGLE

Case Heading (06-48)
Case Number:06-48Case Docketed On:03/08/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:ROGER ROLLINS v. WYOMING TRIBUNE-EAGLE
Full Title:ROGER ROLLINS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WYOMING TRIBUNE-EAGLE, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoger RollinsMitchell E. Osborn
AppelleeWyoming Tribune-EagleCorinne E. Rutledge
James Kaste

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 28
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/08/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, orginal papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/15/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/19/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mitchell E. Osborn for appellant; Corinne E. Rutledge and James C. Kaste for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/19/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/16/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/05/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal