judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRIS ASSOCIATES VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Information: 38140
Short Caption:HARRIS ASSOCIATES VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DISTRICTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49869
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A432013Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/19/2001 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/09/2003 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/21/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Morse & Mowbray--check no. 7222.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11445
07/18/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12222
07/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/19/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 20, 2001. 01-17672
12/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-21540
01/16/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-01062
01/25/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-01757
03/14/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/12/02. Signed by: Christopher H. Byrd. 02-04630
03/14/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-04631
04/11/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/11/02. Signed by: Alan J. Lefebvre. 02-06449
05/15/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 05/13/02. 02-08515
11/26/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 9, 2003, at 9:00 a.m. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB)
12/24/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/09/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
01/21/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order for En Banc Consideration and Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter was held on January 9, 2003, before the Southern Nevada Panel. Upon further review, we have determined that en banc consideration of this appeal is warranted. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision without further argument to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 03-01013
01/21/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision without further argument to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. En Banc
06/17/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Supplemental Briefing. On January 21, 2003, this appeal was submitted for decision to the en banc court. The court has subsequently determined that supplemental briefing would assist the court in the determination of this appeal. The parties shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file supplemental briefs addressing the following question: Whether mandating binding arbitration in public works contracts violates the parties' constitutional right to a jury trial? 03-10107
07/18/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. 03-12191
07/21/2003BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief. 03-12238
12/30/2003Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Per Curiam. 119 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 66. EN BANC. 03-21610
01/27/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-00153
01/27/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/09/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 29, 2004. 04-00153