Case: 12-0106
12-0106
02/06/2012
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
CHARLES DURIVAGE, P.E.
LA ALHAMBRA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2012 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached | |
02/21/2012 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | E-FILED Petition for Review filed on behalf of Charles Durivage, P.E. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/21/2014 | Case Stored - stored case location updated | Row 20 A-2 | | |
06/13/2012 | Case Stored | Row 21 I-3 | | |
06/04/2012 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
06/01/2012 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed | | |
06/01/2012 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Filing granted | unopposed voluntary motion to dismiss appeal granted | |
05/29/2012 | Letter Filed | Respondent La Alhambra Condominium Association's Letter to notify the Court that "[d]ue to the recently filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal we will not be filing a response to their Petition for Review." | ||
05/25/2012 | Motion to dismiss | Unopposed Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of Charles Durivage, P.E. | ||
04/27/2012 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due 05/29/12. | ||
03/27/2012 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
02/21/2012 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |
02/21/2012 | Petition for Review | E-FILED Petition for Review filed on behalf of Charles Durivage, P.E. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | ||
02/07/2012 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition is due February 21, 2012. | |
02/06/2012 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | E-FILED Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Charles Durivage, P.E. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/21/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 20 A-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Durivage, P.E., Charles | Petitioner | Mr. William Ivan Gardner Mr. Gregory Norman Ziegler Mr. Bryan G. Rutherford |
Hispania Development Company, Inc. | Other interested party | Mr. Dennis M. Sanchez |
La Alhambra Condominium Association | Respondent | Mr. Benigno (Trey) Martinez III Mr. Tomas Tijerina |
Texas Windstorm Insurance Association | Other interested party | Ms. Crisanta Emma Guerra |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-11-00324-CV
Aff.(part)Rev.&Rem(part)
___ SW3d ___, 12-21-11
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable Dori Contreras
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Leonel Alejandro
2010-02-869-E