Case: 11-09-00240-CR
11-09-00240-CR
07/24/2009
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
Charles Randal Yarbrough
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/23/2011 | Additional authorities filed | Appellant | |
10/12/2010 | Additional authorities filed | Appellant | |
12/23/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
11/24/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
11/20/2009 | Brief received - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/14/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||||
01/24/2012 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
12/07/2011 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||
10/28/2011 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||
10/14/2011 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
09/30/2011 | Reply to petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
09/01/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/31/2011 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
07/21/2011 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
07/11/2011 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
07/05/2011 | Letter filed | | |||||
06/23/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
06/23/2011 | Response filed | | |||||
06/23/2011 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/23/2011 | Additional authorities filed | | |||||
06/23/2011 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/04/2010 | Submitted | | |||||
10/25/2010 | Response received | | |||||
10/25/2010 | Motion filed | | |||||
10/12/2010 | Motion filed | | |||||
10/12/2010 | Additional authorities filed | | |||||
09/20/2010 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||
12/23/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
12/23/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/24/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
11/20/2009 | Brief received - oral argument requested | | |||||
10/22/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
09/21/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/18/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
08/17/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/29/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
07/24/2009 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
07/24/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
07/14/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
06/18/2009 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/14/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Yarbrough, Charles Randal | Criminal - Appellant | Olney G. Wallis Jeff E. Johnson Michael L. Parker Joseph L. Lanza |
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Heath Hemphill, District Attorney Wesley H. Mau, District Attorney |
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court
Coleman
Honorable John Weeks, Judge
1880
20 years