Case: 03-11-00833-CV
03-11-00833-CV
12/05/2011
Suit affecting parent child relationship - non-accelerated
Nathan Edward Schell
Krystal Woolery Schell
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/18/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
03/21/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
03/09/2012 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/01/2014 | Mandate issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
02/14/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
12/02/2013 | Submitted | | |||||||
11/08/2013 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
07/17/2012 | Oral argument denied | | |||||||
06/18/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
05/18/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
04/24/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/20/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
03/21/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
03/21/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
03/20/2012 | Letter received | | |||||||
03/09/2012 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
03/06/2012 | Letter received | | |||||||
02/28/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
02/09/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
02/08/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
02/06/2012 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||||
01/30/2012 | Letter received | | |||||||
01/09/2012 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
01/09/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
01/09/2012 | Telephone call received | | |||||||
01/04/2012 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
01/03/2012 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
12/21/2011 | Exhibits received | | |||||||
12/21/2011 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||||
12/20/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
12/05/2011 | Letter received | | |||||||
12/05/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/01/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/01/2020 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Schell, Nathan Edward | Appellant | Ms. Kathleen M. Anderson |
Schell, Krystal Woolery | Appellee | Ms. Pamela K. Giese |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Bastrop
Honorable Benton Eskew
10-13778