Case: 15-0274
15-0274
04/06/2015
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
IN THE INTEREST OF L.M.D.M., A CHILD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/2015 | Petition for Review (Parental Termination) | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Thomas M. Marcheleovich. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/05/2015 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
09/25/2015 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
06/26/2015 | Call received | Ms. Anita Stone called on behalf of petitioner to update address. Updated address and resent notice. | | |||||
06/23/2015 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | Notice of Petition filed returned to the Supreme Court. Updated Address unavailable. | | |||||
06/19/2015 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of The Texas Department of Family and Protective Services. | ||||||
06/09/2015 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
06/04/2015 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | Affidavit of Inability to Pay filed on behalf of Thomas M. Marcheleovich. | ||||||
06/03/2015 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to counsel for Petitioner, left message with paralegal stating that they must remedy the errors with the petition for review by Friday, June 5, 2015 or document will be struck on orders. | | |||||
05/27/2015 | Notice of Appearance | Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed on behalf of Thomas M. Marcheleovich. M. Patrick Maguire, of the law firm of M. Patrick Maguire, P.C., appears as counsel for Petitioner Thomas M. Marcheleovich. | ||||||
05/27/2015 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to attorney Mr. Maguire asking him to file an affidavit of indigency on behalf of his client. | | |||||
05/27/2015 | Petition for Review (Parental Termination) | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Thomas M. Marcheleovich. |
| |||||
04/17/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioner Thomas Marcheleovich has been granted. Petition is due May 27, 2015. |
| ||||
04/13/2015 | Call received | From Ms. Anita Stone, mother of petitoner to inform the Court that the $10 fee for the m/e/t will be coming before the end of the week. | | |||||
04/07/2015 | Electronic communication sent to Party | E-mailed Mr. Becker, counsel for Respondent, inquiring if Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review will be opposed, and if so, whether a response will be filed. Mr. Becker responded that the motion is unopposed. | | |||||
04/07/2015 | Notice requesting filing fee | Fee request for Motion for Extension of Time sent to Petitioner Thomas Marcheleovich. |
| |||||
04/06/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioner Thomas Marcheleovich. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/05/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marcheleovich, Thomas M. | Petitioner | Mr. M. Patrick Maguire Mr. Thomas M. Marcheleovich |
Texas Department of Family and Protective Services | Respondent | Mr. Michael D. Becker Mr. Robert Douglas Campbell |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-14-00739-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 03-11-15
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable Luz Elena D Chapa
Trial Court Information
216th District Court
Gillespie
Honorable Robert R. Barton
13426