judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIXON VS. COUNTY OF CLARK

Case Information: 38139
Short Caption:DIXON VS. COUNTY OF CLARKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A271156Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/18/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11441
07/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17124
01/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant has petitioned for rehearing. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, to the petition for rehearing. 02-01955
02/13/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 02-02828
05/15/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Granted. Order Granting Rehearing, Reinstating Appeal, and directing District Court to Rule on NRAP 24(A) Application. This is a proper person petition for rehearing of our October 11, 2001 order dismissing this appeal as abandoned because appellant failed to respond to our notice to pay the filing fee. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] We grant the petition for rehearing and reinstate this appeal. We direct the district court to enter an order in compliance with NRAP 24 within 30 days from the date of this order, and to provide a copy of the order to this court. 02-08493
06/19/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on June 14, 2002. 02-10669
06/19/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Order waiving fees filed in the district court on June 14, 2002.
06/21/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn2[NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings).] fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 02-10753
07/18/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 02-12307
07/18/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/18/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[Although appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered appellant's proper person documents.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-21619
01/06/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/14/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 03-00436
01/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 16, 2003. 03-00436