judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DON PADOU, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTROL BOARD

Case Information: 10-CV-0930
Short Caption:DON PADOU, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTROL BOARDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2750-10Filed Date:07/26/2010

Opening Event Date:07/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDon Padou NPro SeN
AppellantAbigail PadouNPro SeN
AppelleeD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 26, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b) (3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 7/14/10) (elp)
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (65-pgs/tape 7/14/10 proc.)w/cd attached
08/31/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/25/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/25/2010APPENDIX
11/23/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 3, 2011 (no oppo)
11/29/2010 On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an enlargement of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 3, 2011. (JAC) elp
01/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 45 days
01/20/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an enlargement of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 17, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
02/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/22/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - reply
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
03/04/2011APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to oppo to aplt's motion for summary affirmance to 1 week. no oppo
03/08/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLEE'S RESPONSE shall be filed NO LATER THAN MARCH 11, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
03/11/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY- of it's motion for summary affirmance
04/13/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...Appellants' lack of standing to bring a a 42 U.S.C.  1983 OR 1985 claim with respect to an action of the ABC Board because they failed to demonstrate a substantial injury that is particularized, accurate or imminent...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
04/13/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order IS AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
04/25/2011APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING no oppo 30 days
04/29/2011ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH on or before May 27, 2011. (WH)
03/18/2014FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/19/2014FiledMandate