Case Information: 47148 | |||
Short Caption: | DAYMON (GREGORY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48807 , 50082 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C216890 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/20/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 06-08430 | |
04/20/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
04/28/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 06-08997 | |
05/08/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion. Clark County Public Defender's Motion to Compel Comliance with Rule 3C of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. | 06-09580 | |
05/17/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The district court's order allowing Mace Yampolsky to withdraw is without effect. Fast Track Statement due: 30 days. Yampolsky is cautioned that failure to comply with NRAP 3C and the orders of this court may result in the imposition of sanctions. Fn1 [The Clark County Public Defender shall continue as appellate counsel, and may file a supplemental fast track statement if necessary, as provided by NRAP 3C (g).] | 06-10367 | |
06/21/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 06-12927 | |
06/21/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 06-12928 | |
07/13/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 06-14527 | |
07/13/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 06-14528 | |
08/14/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-16889 | |
09/08/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-17488 | |
09/08/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/15/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 11, 2006. | 06-17488 |