Case: 11-13-00002-CV
11-13-00002-CV
01/03/2013
Damages
Estanislao Ortega
Donald Gene Cheshier and Cheryl Diane Cheshier
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/29/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
03/28/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/26/2015 | Case stored | | |||||||
03/26/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
01/29/2015 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
01/29/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
01/29/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
08/21/2014 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/28/2014 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
04/29/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
04/29/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
03/28/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
03/01/2013 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
02/07/2013 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
02/06/2013 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
01/10/2013 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
01/03/2013 | Fee paid | | |||||||
01/03/2013 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
01/03/2013 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
01/02/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
11/14/2012 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
10/16/2012 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||||
10/12/2012 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
03/26/2021 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cheshier, Cheryl Diane | Appellee | Kimberly Pack Wilson |
Cheshier, Donald Gene | Appellee | Kimberly Pack Wilson |
Ortega, Estanislao | Appellant | Gale Warren |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Erath
Honorable E. Bart McDougal, Judge
CV07631
Traci Johnston, Court Reporter