Case: 14-89-00557-CR
14-89-00557-CR
06/16/1989
Assault & battery
Hogan, Kenneth
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/1990 | Case stored | | |
09/04/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/04/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/20/1990 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
08/03/1990 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
07/19/1990 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
07/19/1990 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
07/18/1990 | Submitted | | |
07/18/1990 | Submission | | |
07/18/1990 | Submitted | | |
08/31/1989 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/30/1989 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/30/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/30/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/18/1989 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/21/1989 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/21/1989 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
06/16/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/15/1989 | Transcript FILED | | |
05/10/1989 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
04/26/1989 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/12/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | James B. Hicks |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Peter C. Speers, III |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
9th District Court
Waller
6037
16 years TDC