Case: 09-10-00266-CV
09-10-00266-CV
06/01/2010
Special Appearance
Quartz Castle, Inc. D/B/A Generator Joe
Jade Consolidated Management, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/21/2010 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
09/14/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
08/05/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/02/2011 | Case stored | | |||
03/02/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||
12/16/2010 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
10/12/2010 | Submitted | | |||
09/30/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
09/21/2010 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||
09/21/2010 | Reply brief filed | | |||
09/14/2010 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/14/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
09/08/2010 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
09/07/2010 | Letter filed | | |||
09/07/2010 | Letter filed | | |||
09/07/2010 | Motion for emergency relief filed | | |||
08/27/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/27/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
08/26/2010 | Record checked in | | |||
08/20/2010 | Record checked out | | |||
08/18/2010 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
08/16/2010 | Record checked in | | |||
08/11/2010 | Record checked out | | |||
08/05/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
07/16/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||
06/28/2010 | Record checked in | | |||
06/23/2010 | Record checked out | | |||
06/15/2010 | Record checked in | | |||
06/09/2010 | Record checked out | | |||
06/08/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||
06/08/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||
06/03/2010 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | Accelerated | | ||
06/01/2010 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
06/01/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | Accelerated | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/02/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Quartz Castle, Inc. | Appellant | Judge Kristin Bays |
Jade Consolidated Management, Inc. | Appellee | William F. Harmeyer William Fowler |
Trial Court Information
9th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Frederick E Edwards
08-10-10141 CV