judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. DEAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0908
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. DEAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM777-10Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Dean Y
Christine PembrokeNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Christine Pembroke, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent apellatn in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christine Pembroke, Esquire
08/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (87pgs/Tape) 6/21/10 proc.
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (161pgs/Tape) 6/22/10 proc. w/CD included
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
09/28/2010RECORD INDEX
09/28/2010RECORD COPIES
11/03/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) Granted
11/09/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED MICHAEL A. DEAN 1300 ELI PLACE LANDOVER, MD 20743 *****CURRENT ADDRESS PROVIDED BY COUNSEL LW
11/10/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 6, 2010, FILE ANY RESPONSE showing with specificity, any reason why counsel's motion sould not be granted and the conviction, order or judgment on appeal affirmed... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of court-appointed counsel to withdraw is HELD IN ABEYANCE... (BY: ETW)
11/10/2010TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
02/22/2011 ORDERED that the motion to WITHDRAW IS GRANTED. See ANDERS V. CALIFORNIA...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal in this case be and HEREBY IS AFFIRMED. (FIBEFA) (cb)
03/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED