judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN L. McLAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-36)
Case Number:06-36Case Docketed On:02/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:KEVIN L. McLAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEVIN L. McLAIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin L. McLainKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/17/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed copy)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original signature)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
08/17/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/17/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal