judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICKARD VS. MONTGOMERY WARD

Case Information: 38122
Short Caption:RICKARD VS. MONTGOMERY WARDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A318519Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/27/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/05/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Frederick Siegfreid Geihs Trust Account--check no. 3937.
07/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11292
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12426
07/25/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
10/24/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 14, 2002. 01-17928
01/17/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 11, 2002. 02-01206
02/21/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 30 days for further negotiations. 02-03319
07/23/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-12633
11/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Monte Hall shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court whether this appeal is automatically stayed pursuant to the federal bankruptcy code. 02-18816
11/25/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Respondent's Report Regarding Automatic Stay. 02-20268
03/17/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. As noted in our November 1, 2002, order, an appeal for the purposes of the automatic bankruptcy stay is considered a continuation of the action in the trial court. Accordingly, because the automatic stay was lifted in the district court, this appeal is not subject to the automatic bankruptcy stay. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-04417
03/28/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-05237
06/30/2003BriefFiled Opening Brief. 03-10878
06/30/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 03-10879
08/01/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. 03-12991
08/01/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 03-12992
09/12/2003Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
02/24/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 04-03529
02/24/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP04S-MS/RR/WM.
04/27/2004Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP04D-RR/WM/MD
09/02/2004Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before Rose/Maupin/Douglas. Author: Per Curiam. 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. SNP04D 04-15963
09/28/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-16357
09/28/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 30, 2004. 04-16357