judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SIMPSON KING v. FEDERAL UNDERWRITERS EXCHANGE

Case: A-720
A-720
01/02/1945
Application for Writ of Error
SIMPSON KING
FEDERAL UNDERWRITERS EXCHANGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/30/1946Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/01/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/02/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/30/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/07/1945Bond
11/21/1945Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/01/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/02/1945Brief on the Merits
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Simpson KingPetitioner
Federal Underwriters ExchangeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information