Case: 12-10-00400-CR
12-10-00400-CR
11/29/2010
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Lori L. Pinon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/25/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
05/25/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | State | |
04/13/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
04/13/2011 | Brief received - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/2011 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |
11/28/2011 | Case stored | | |
11/28/2011 | Mandate issued | | |
11/28/2011 | Notice filed | | |
11/23/2011 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |
11/17/2011 | Telephone call received | | |
11/04/2011 | Fax received | | |
11/04/2011 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |
10/27/2011 | Notice filed | | |
10/21/2011 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |
10/20/2011 | Fax received | | |
10/07/2011 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |
10/06/2011 | Order entered | Remanded | |
09/23/2011 | Late compliance notice | | |
09/22/2011 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
09/07/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/30/2011 | Submitted | | |
06/09/2011 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |
06/07/2011 | Prescreened | | |
06/01/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/25/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/25/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
05/25/2011 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |
05/25/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/20/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/13/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |
04/13/2011 | Brief received - oral argument requested | | |
04/13/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/11/2011 | Telephone call received | | |
03/30/2011 | Notice of late brief | | |
03/09/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/03/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/09/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/07/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/07/2011 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |
02/07/2011 | Letter filed | | |
01/28/2011 | Notice of late brief | | |
12/28/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |
12/27/2010 | Docketing statement filed | | |
12/20/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |
12/13/2010 | Notice of late docketing statement | | |
12/01/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
11/29/2010 | Court packet sent to parties | | |
11/29/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed | | |
11/29/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |
11/29/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |
10/12/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |
09/28/2010 | Trial court certification filed | | |
09/28/2010 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/28/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/28/2036 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pinon, Lori L. | Criminal - Appellant | Ms. R. Jeanette Parham |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Judge Joe N. Dean Mr. Bennie L. Schiro |
Trial Court Information
411th District Court
Trinity
Honorable Robert Hill Trapp
008829
3 Years/TDCJ-CID