judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AAMIR LLOYD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0909
Short Caption:AAMIR LLOYD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3091-10Filed Date:07/19/2010

Opening Event Date:07/19/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAamir Lloyd YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
William L. Woodruff NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond Rigat, Esquire
08/16/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (33 pgs/Tape -6/18/10 proc.)(w/CD attached)
09/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/09/2010RECORD COPIES
09/14/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached to brief
09/14/2010APPENDIX
10/18/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/19/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appdendix
11/30/2010 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRNATED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli INc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
11/30/2010 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and hereby is AFFIRMED. (RDBRNW) (rm)
12/07/2010CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
12/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived