judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD A. COFFINBERRY v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF HOT SPRINGS, WYOMING

Case Heading (06-175)
Case Number:06-175Case Docketed On:07/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:RICHARD A. COFFINBERRY v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF HOT SPRINGS, WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD A. COFFINBERRY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF HOT SPRINGS, WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard A. Coffinberry Pro Se
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Hot Springs County, WyomingRonald P. Jurovich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/28/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/18/2006Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
09/21/2006Event - Phone Call from appellant. He received docket letter but did not read it clearly and therefore did not realize his briefing schedule had started. Advised him that he has 15 days to file a petition for reinstatement.EventPhone CallFinal
09/26/2006Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
09/29/2006Response/Objection - Other - petition for reinstatement and brief in support of objectionResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
10/10/2006Order - Denying petition for reinstatement of appealOrderDenyFinal
10/10/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal